Order
|
Minister
|
Party
|
Prime Minister
|
Title
|
Term start
|
Term end
|
Term in office
|
1
|
Tom Uren
|
|
Labor
|
Whitlam
|
Minister for Urban and Regional Development
|
19 December 1972 (1972-12-19)
|
11 November 1975 (1975-11-11)
|
2 years, 327 days
|
2
|
John Carrick
|
|
Liberal
|
Fraser
|
11 November 1975 (1975-11-11)
|
22 December 1975 (1975-12-22)
|
41 days
|
|
3
|
Jamie Briggs
|
|
Liberal
|
Abbott
|
Assistant Minister for Infrastructure and Regional Development
|
18 September 2013 (2013-09-18)
|
15 September 2015
|
2 years, 102 days
|
Turnbull
|
15 September 2015 (2015-09-15)
|
21 September 2015
|
Minister for Cities and the Built Environment
|
21 September 2015 (2015-09-21)
|
29 December 2015
|
|
4
|
Paul Fletcher
|
|
Liberal
|
Turnbull
|
Minister for Urban Infrastructure
|
19 July 2016 (2016-07-19)
|
20 December 2017 (2017-12-20)
|
2 years, 39 days
|
Minister for Urban Infrastructure and Cities
|
20 December 2017 (2017-12-20)
|
28 August 2018 (2018-08-28)
|
5
|
Alan Tudge
|
Morrison
|
Minister for Cities, Urban Infrastructure and Population
|
28 August 2018 (2018-08-28)
|
29 May 2019 (2019-05-29)
|
2 years, 116 days
|
Minister for Population, Cities and Urban Infrastructure
|
29 May 2019 (2019-05-29)
|
22 December 2020 (2020-12-22)
|
(4)
|
Paul Fletcher
|
Minister for Communications, Urban Infrastructure, Cities and the Arts
|
22 December 2020 (2020-12-22)
|
23 May 2022 (2022-05-23)
|
1 year, 152 days
|
|
6
|
Jenny McAllister
|
|
Labor
|
Albanese
|
Minister for Cities
|
29 July 2024 (2024-07-29)
|
Incumbent
|
60 days
|