Order
|
Minister
|
Party
|
Prime Minister
|
Title
|
Term start
|
Term end
|
Term in office
|
1
|
Peter Morris
|
|
Labor
|
Hawke
|
Minister for Housing and Aged Care
|
19 January 1988 (1988-01-19)
|
15 February 1988 (1988-02-15)
|
27 days
|
2
|
Peter Staples
|
|
15 February 1988 (1988-02-15)
|
7 May 1990 (1990-05-07)
|
5 years, 64 days
|
Minister for Aged, Family and Health Services
|
7 May 1990 (1990-05-07)
|
20 December 1991 (1991-12-20)
|
Keating
|
20 December 1991 (1991-12-20)
|
24 March 1993 (1993-03-24)
|
|
3
|
Bronwyn Bishop
|
|
Liberal
|
Howard
|
Minister for Aged Care
|
21 October 1998 (1998-10-21)
|
26 November 2001 (2001-11-26)
|
3 years, 36 days
|
4
|
Kevin Andrews
|
|
Minister for Ageing
|
26 November 2001 (2001-11-26)
|
7 October 2003 (2003-10-07)
|
1 year, 315 days
|
5
|
Julie Bishop
|
|
7 October 2003 (2003-10-07)
|
27 January 2006 (2006-01-27)
|
2 years, 112 days
|
6
|
Santo Santoro
|
|
27 January 2006 (2006-01-27)
|
21 March 2007 (2007-03-21)
|
1 year, 53 days
|
7
|
Christopher Pyne
|
|
21 March 2007 (2007-03-21)
|
3 December 2007 (2007-12-03)
|
257 days
|
8
|
Justine Elliot
|
|
Labor
|
Rudd
|
3 December 2007 (2007-12-03)
|
28 June 2010 (2010-06-28)
|
2 years, 207 days
|
9
|
Mark Butler
|
|
Gillard
|
Minister for Mental Health and Ageing
|
28 June 2010 (2010-06-28)
|
1 July 2013 (2013-07-01)
|
3 years, 3 days
|
10
|
Jacinta Collins
|
|
Rudd
|
1 July 2013 (2013-07-01)
|
18 September 2013 (2013-09-18)
|
79 days
|
|
11
|
Sussan Ley
|
|
Liberal
|
Turnbull
|
Minister for Aged Care
|
30 September 2015 (2015-09-30)
|
19 July 2016 (2016-07-19)
|
1 year, 105 days
|
Minister for Health and Ageing
|
19 July 2016 (2016-07-19)
|
13 January 2017 (2017-01-13)
|
(acting)
|
Arthur Sinodinos[3]
|
13 January 2017 (2017-01-13)
|
24 January 2017 (2017-01-24)
|
11 days
|
12
|
Ken Wyatt
|
Minister for Aged Care
|
24 January 2017 (2017-01-24)
|
28 August 2018 (2018-08-28)
|
2 years, 125 days
|
Morrison
|
Minister for Senior Australians and Aged Care
|
28 August 2018 (2018-08-28)
|
29 May 2019 (2019-05-29)
|
13
|
Richard Colbeck
|
Minister for Aged Care and Senior Australians
|
29 May 2019 (2019-05-29)
|
22 December 2020 (2020-12-22)
|
2 years, 359 days
|
Minister for Senior Australians and Aged Care Services
|
22 December 2020 (2020-12-22)
|
23 May 2022 (2022-05-23)
|
(9)
|
Mark Butler
|
|
Labor
|
Albanese
|
Minister for Health and Aged Care
|
1 June 2022 (2022-06-01)
|
Incumbent
|
2 years, 118 days
|
14
|
Anika Wells
|
Minister for Aged Care
|